MI HB5261 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Re-referred To Committee On Local Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Re-referred To Committee On Local Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; funds; funding for township road construction projects; provide for. Amends sec. 11 of 1851 PA 156 (MCL 46.11).
Title
Transportation; funds; funding for township road construction projects; provide for. Amends sec. 11 of 1851 PA 156 (MCL 46.11).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Local Government |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-02-24 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2016-02-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2016-01-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/27/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2016-01-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Triston Cole |
Same As/Similar To
SB0729 (Same As) 2016-04-13 - Assigned Pa 0077'16 With Immediate Effect