MI HB5261 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on August 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-13 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-13 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; delinquent taxes; second notice of forfeiture; revise. Amends sec. 78f of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.78f).
Title
Property tax; delinquent taxes; second notice of forfeiture; revise. Amends sec. 78f of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.78f).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-13 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-10-13 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-08-26 | Printed Bill Filed 08/20/2009 | |
2009-08-19 | Referred To Committee On Urban Policy | |
2009-08-19 | Read A First Time | |
2009-08-19 | Introduced By Representative Goeff Hansen |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2009-HB-5261 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2009-2010/billintroduced/House/htm/2009-HIB-5261.htm |