MI HB5256 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred To Committee On Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Occupations; junk and secondhand dealers; hold process for acquired goods; establish. Amends title & secs. 5 & 6 of 1917 PA 350 (MCL 445.405 & 445.406) & adds sec. 6a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupations; junk and secondhand dealers; hold process for acquired goods; establish. Amends title & secs. 5 & 6 of 1917 PA 350 (MCL 445.405 & 445.406) & adds sec. 6a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 138 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateReferred To Committee On Commerce
2018-03-07HouseTransmitted
2018-03-07HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 138 Yeas 107 Nays 1
2018-03-07HouseRead A Third Time
2018-03-06HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-03-06HouseRead A Second Time
2018-02-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-02-27HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-11-29HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 11/28/2017
2017-11-28HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
2017-11-28HouseRead A First Time
2017-11-28HouseIntroduced By Representative Peter Lucido

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback