MI HB5245 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Taxation; hotel-motel tax; collection of interest on delinquent assessment; modify. Amends sec. 5 of 1980 PA 395 (MCL 141.875).
Title
Taxation; hotel-motel tax; collection of interest on delinquent assessment; modify. Amends sec. 5 of 1980 PA 395 (MCL 141.875).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 180 (Y: 83 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 180 (Y: 83 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2012-04-19 | House | Transmitted |
2012-04-19 | House | Passed Roll Call # 180 Yeas 83 Nays 26 |
2012-04-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-04-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-04-18 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2012-04-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2012-01-18 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/18/2012 |
2012-01-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2012-01-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-01-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Wayne Schmidt |