MI HB5244 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Assigned Pa 138'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Assigned Pa 138'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Labor: fair employment practices; public act regarding employment activities related to COVID-19; repeal. Amends sec. 10 of 2020 PA 238 (MCL 419.410) & repeals 2020 PA 238 (MCL 419.401 - 419.413). TIE BAR WITH: HB 6128'22, HB 6215'22
Title
Labor: fair employment practices; public act regarding employment activities related to COVID-19; repeal. Amends sec. 10 of 2020 PA 238 (MCL 419.410) & repeals 2020 PA 238 (MCL 419.401 - 419.413). TIE BAR WITH: HB 6128'22, HB 6215'22
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Fink [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 365 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 314 (Y: 73 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 314 (Y: 73 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | House | Assigned Pa 138'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-07-01 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/11/2022 12:04 Pm |
2022-07-01 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/11/2022 08:02 Am |
2022-06-29 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/29/2022 02:02 Pm |
2022-06-28 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-23 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 365 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2022-06-15 | House | Transmitted |
2022-06-15 | House | Title Amended |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 314 Yeas 73 Nays 32 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-06-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2022-06-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2021-07-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/01/2021 |
2021-07-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-07-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-07-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrew Fink |