MI HB5243 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 17'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 17'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: other; annual audited financial requirements; modify. Amends secs. 1001 & 1027 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1001 & 500.1027) & adds sec. 1028.
Title
Insurance: other; annual audited financial requirements; modify. Amends secs. 1001 & 1027 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1001 & 500.1027) & adds sec. 1028.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 14 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 335 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 335 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned Pa 17'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/27/2020 03:26 Pm |
2020-01-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 01/27/2020 01:55 Pm |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 01/17/2020 02:58 Pm |
2020-01-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-01-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-01-15 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2019-12-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 335 Yeas 103 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |