MI HB5235 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Labor; public service employment; changes in provisions concerning teacher strikes; provide for. Amends secs. 2a & 6 of 1947 PA 336 (MCL 423.202a & 423.206).
Title
Labor; public service employment; changes in provisions concerning teacher strikes; provide for. Amends secs. 2a & 6 of 1947 PA 336 (MCL 423.202a & 423.206).
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Amanda Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/26/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2016-01-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-01-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Tim Kelly |
Same As/Similar To
SB0713 (Same As) 2016-02-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
Subjects
Education: employees
Labor: arbitration
Labor: collective bargaining
Labor: public service employment
Labor: public service labor disputes
Labor: arbitration
Labor: collective bargaining
Labor: public service employment
Labor: public service labor disputes
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2016-HB-5235 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billintroduced/House/htm/2016-HIB-5235.htm |