MI HB5229 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Local government; intergovernmental affairs; tax levied under the municipal partnership act; modify. Amends sec. 7 of 2011 PA 258 (MCL 124.117).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government; intergovernmental affairs; tax levied under the municipal partnership act; modify. Amends sec. 7 of 2011 PA 258 (MCL 124.117).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2019-12-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-12-10HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-4)
2019-12-04HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
2019-11-13HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 11/13/2019
2019-11-07HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation
2019-11-07HouseRead A First Time
2019-11-07HouseIntroduced By Representative Jason Sheppard

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback