MI HB5220 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 463'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 463'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; tax tribunal; informal settlement conference; require if requested by petitioner. Amends 1973 PA 186 (MCL 205.701 - 205.779) by adding sec. 62b.
Title
Property tax; tax tribunal; informal settlement conference; require if requested by petitioner. Amends 1973 PA 186 (MCL 205.701 - 205.779) by adding sec. 62b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 897 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 996 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 529 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 996 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 529 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 463'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 3:26 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2012 @ 10:54 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 2:48 Pm |
2012-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 897 Yeas 105 Nays 0 |
2012-12-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 996 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2012-09-19 | House | Transmitted |
2012-09-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 529 Yeas 105 Nays 0 |
2012-09-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-09-19 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-09-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-09-19 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-09-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-06-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-06-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-12-14 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/14/2011 |
2011-12-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2011-12-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-12-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Marty Knollenberg |