MI HB5217 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 366'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 366'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education: other; preventing a student athlete from receiving compensation for the use of his or her name, image, likeness, or reputation; prohibit. Creates new act.
Title
Higher education: other; preventing a student athlete from receiving compensation for the use of his or her name, image, likeness, or reputation; prohibit. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 648 (Y: 93 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 571 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 563 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 212 (Y: 94 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 571 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 563 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 212 (Y: 94 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 366'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/04/2021 12:24 Pm |
2020-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/30/2020 10:04 Am |
2020-12-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 07:03 Pm |
2020-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-21 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 648 Yeas 93 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 |
2020-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-12-21 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 596 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 571 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 563 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-05-27 | House | Transmitted |
2020-05-27 | House | Title Amended |
2020-05-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 212 Yeas 94 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-05-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Substitute (h-5) Adopted |
2020-05-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-5) |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-11-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/13/2019 |
2019-11-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2019-11-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-11-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |