MI HB5213 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; petitions; organizations employing paid signature gatherers to register with the secretary of state; require, and provide for penalties. Amends 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.1 - 168.992) by adding secs. 484a & 956a.
Title
Elections; petitions; organizations employing paid signature gatherers to register with the secretary of state; require, and provide for penalties. Amends 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.1 - 168.992) by adding secs. 484a & 956a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-11-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/01/2017 |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2017-11-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Sheldon Neeley |
Subjects
Constitutional amendments: state
Elections: ballot proposals
Elections: election officials
Elections: initiative and referendum
Elections: offenses
Elections: petitions
Elections: recall
State agencies (existing): state
Elections: ballot proposals
Elections: election officials
Elections: initiative and referendum
Elections: offenses
Elections: petitions
Elections: recall
State agencies (existing): state