MI HB5205 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles: registration; issuance of 2-year recreation passport; provide for under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 805 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.805). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5204'19
Title
Vehicles: registration; issuance of 2-year recreation passport; provide for under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 805 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.805). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5204'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-12-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-09-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-11-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/07/2019 |
2019-11-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-11-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-11-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Gary Eisen |