MI HB5203 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Retirement: county employees; employment of retirant in a county sheriff’s office; allow without forfeiting retirement allowance. Amends sec. 12a of 1851 PA 156 (MCL 46.12a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement: county employees; employment of retirant in a county sheriff’s office; allow without forfeiting retirement allowance. Amends sec. 12a of 1851 PA 156 (MCL 46.12a).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 26 (Y: 94 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2024-06-12SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2024-03-14SenateReferred To Committee On Local Government
2024-03-13HouseTransmitted
2024-03-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 26 Yeas 94 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2024-03-13HouseRead A Third Time
2024-03-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-03-12HouseRead A Second Time
2024-03-06HouseReferred To Second Reading
2024-03-06HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2023-10-25HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/24/2023
2023-10-24HouseReferred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
2023-10-24HouseRead A First Time
2023-10-24HouseIntroduced By Representative Kelly Breen

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-HB-5203
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/House/htm/2023-HIB-5203.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/House/htm/2023-HEBH-5203.htm
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-5203-D3624418.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-5203-C20F6D3A.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-5203-L.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-5203-S.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-5203-F.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-03-06-022.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-03-13-024.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2024-SJ-06-12-058.htm

Bill Comments

feedback