MI HB5196 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 423'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 423'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public employees and officers; compensation and benefits; details of compensation package and severance payment agreements for employees; require posting. Creates new act.
Title
Public employees and officers; compensation and benefits; details of compensation package and severance payment agreements for employees; require posting. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas McMillin [R] | Rep. Kurt Heise [R] | Rep. Joel Johnson [R] | Rep. Earl Poleski [R] |
Rep. David Agema [R] | Rep. Peter Pettalia [R] | Rep. Frank Foster [R] | Rep. Nancy Jenkins [R] |
Rep. John Olumba [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 849 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 951 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 320 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 951 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 320 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | House | Assigned Pa 423'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2012 @ 2:13 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 9:07 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 9:58 Am |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | House | Roll Call # 849 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | House | Rule Suspended |
2012-12-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 951 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing |
2012-05-30 | House | Transmitted |
2012-05-30 | House | Title Amended |
2012-05-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 320 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2012-05-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-23 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2012-05-23 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2012-05-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-12-06 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/02/2011 |
2011-12-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics |
2011-12-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-12-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Mcmillin |
Subjects
Labor, hours and wages
Public employees and officers, compensation and benefits
Public employees and officers, state
Records, public
Public employees and officers, compensation and benefits
Public employees and officers, state
Records, public