MI HB5190 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-18 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
Hearing: May 17 @ 12:00 pm in Room 1300, Binsfeld Office Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Education: curriculum; requirements for Michigan merit curriculum; modify. Amends secs. 1278a & 1278b of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1278a & 380.1278b).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education: curriculum; requirements for Michigan merit curriculum; modify. Amends secs. 1278a & 1278b of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1278a & 380.1278b).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 566 (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-18SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
2022-05-18SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2021-12-02SenateReferred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness
2021-12-01HouseTransmitted
2021-12-01HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 566 Yeas 57 Nays 43 Excused 0 Not Voting 7
2021-12-01HouseRead A Third Time
2021-11-10HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-11-10HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2021-11-10HouseRead A Second Time
2021-11-02HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-11-02HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-07-14HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 07/01/2021
2021-07-01HouseReferred To Committee On Education
2021-07-01HouseRead A First Time
2021-07-01HouseIntroduced By Representative Diana Farrington

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-5190
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-5190.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-5190.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5190-0N295.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5190-1977D9F1.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5190-789D6E15.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5190-33C8F24E.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-5190-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-5190-S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-11-02-091.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-12-01-097.htm

Bill Comments

feedback