MI HB5190 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-10-14 - Referred To Committee On Senior Citizens And Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Senior Citizens & Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-10-14 - Referred To Committee On Senior Citizens And Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Senior Citizens & Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; reports; senior medical alert program; provide for. Creates new act.
Title
Law enforcement; reports; senior medical alert program; provide for. Creates new act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-14 | Referred To Committee On Senior Citizens And Veterans Affairs | |
2009-10-13 | Transmitted | |
2009-10-13 | Title Amended | |
2009-10-13 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 496 Yeas 105 Nays 0 | |
2009-10-13 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-10-13 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-10-13 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-10-13 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2009-10-13 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-09-09 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-09-09 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-07-15 | Printed Bill Filed 07/15/2009 | |
2009-07-14 | Referred To Committee On Senior Health, Security, And Retirement | |
2009-07-14 | Read A First Time | |
2009-07-14 | Introduced By Representative Mark Meadows |