MI HB5188 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health: emergency response; issuing an emergency order that restricts certain gun-related activities during an epidemic; prohibit. Amends secs. 2253 & 2453 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2253 & 333.2453).
Title
Health: emergency response; issuing an emergency order that restricts certain gun-related activities during an epidemic; prohibit. Amends secs. 2253 & 2453 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2253 & 333.2453).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 105 (Y: 62 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2022-03-10 | House | Transmitted |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 105 Yeas 62 Nays 39 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-03-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-11-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-11-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-07-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/01/2021 |
2021-07-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2021-07-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-07-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Pat Outman |
Subjects
Health: emergency response
Health: local health departments
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Weapons: other
Health: local health departments
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Weapons: other