MI HB5188 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Assigned Pa 30'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Assigned Pa 30'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use tax; exemptions; reimbursement of revenue lost to school aid fund as result of certain exemptions; provide for. Amends sec. 21 of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.111).
Title
Use tax; exemptions; reimbursement of revenue lost to school aid fund as result of certain exemptions; provide for. Amends sec. 21 of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.111).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 41 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 38 (Y: 96 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 38 (Y: 96 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned Pa 30'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-02-18 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 02/13/2020 02:49 Pm |
2020-02-18 | House | Approved By The Governor 02/13/2020 02:24 Pm |
2020-02-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 02/12/2020 12:22 Pm |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-01-23 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-02-11 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 41 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2020-01-23 | House | Transmitted |
2020-01-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 38 Yeas 96 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-01-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-01-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-01-22 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2020-01-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-11-05 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/05/2019 |
2019-10-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
2019-10-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-31 | House | Introduced By Representative Mark Huizenga |