MI HB5182 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Assigned Pa 92'24 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Assigned Pa 92'24 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: larceny; use of a computer or similar technology to program a key code for automobile theft; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends sec. 116 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.116).
Title
Crimes: larceny; use of a computer or similar technology to program a key code for automobile theft; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends sec. 116 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.116).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 296 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 50 (Y: 88 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 50 (Y: 88 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | House | Assigned Pa 92'24 With Immediate Effect |
2024-07-30 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 11:52 Am |
2024-07-30 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/23/2024 09:52 Am |
2024-06-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 07/11/2024 01:04 Pm |
2024-06-26 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2024-06-26 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2024-06-26 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 296 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2024-05-01 | House | Transmitted |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 50 Yeas 88 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2024-05-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2023-10-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/19/2023 |
2023-10-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2023-10-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Denise Mentzer |