MI HB5176 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 161'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 161'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; grants and transfers; state administrative board limitations; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 1921 PA 2 (MCL 17.3).
Title
Appropriations; grants and transfers; state administrative board limitations; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 1921 PA 2 (MCL 17.3).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 343 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 338 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 339 (Y: 57 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 338 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 339 (Y: 57 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 161'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2019 11:06 Am |
2019-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2019 10:08 Am |
2019-12-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2019 02:39 Pm |
2019-12-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-12-10 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 343 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-12-10 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-12-10 | House | Rule Suspended |
2019-12-10 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-12-10 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 338 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-12-04 | House | Transmitted |
2019-12-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 339 Yeas 57 Nays 48 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2019-12-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-12-04 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-12-04 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-11-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-11-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-10-30 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/30/2019 |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-10-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Shane Hernandez |