MI HB5175 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - Re-referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - Re-referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; grants and transfers; state administrative board limitations; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 1921 PA 2 (MCL 17.3).
Title
Appropriations; grants and transfers; state administrative board limitations; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 1921 PA 2 (MCL 17.3).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-11-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-11-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-10-30 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/30/2019 |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-10-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Ben Frederick |