MI HB5161 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco; other; vapor products or alternative nicotine products that contain vitamin E acetate; prohibit sale. Creates new act.
Title
Tobacco; other; vapor products or alternative nicotine products that contain vitamin E acetate; prohibit sale. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Bellino [R] | Rep. Abdullah Hammoud [D] | Rep. Mari Manoogian [D] | Rep. Nate Shannon [D] |
Rep. Frank Liberati [D] | Rep. Phil Green [R] | Rep. Kyra Bolden [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 (Y: 102 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-02-06 | House | Transmitted |
2020-02-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 Yeas 102 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-01-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-01-30 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-01-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-10-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/29/2019 |
2019-10-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-10-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Joseph Bellino |