MI HB5149 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-26 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Economic Development & Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-26 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Economic Development & Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; unfair trade practices; insurance whistleblower protection fund; create. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 2035a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4846'09, HB 5144'09
Title
Insurance; unfair trade practices; insurance whistleblower protection fund; create. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 2035a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4846'09, HB 5144'09
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Ebli [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform | |
2009-08-19 | Transmitted | |
2009-08-19 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 374 Yeas 63 Nays 44 | |
2009-08-19 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-08-19 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-08-19 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-08-19 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-08-19 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-08-19 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-07-14 | Printed Bill Filed 06/26/2009 | |
2009-06-25 | Referred To Committee On Insurance | |
2009-06-25 | Read A First Time | |
2009-06-25 | Introduced By Representative Kate Ebli |