MI HB5140 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment
Pending: Senate Economic Development And International Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Education; school districts; access to high school pupil directory for representatives of proprietary schools, community colleges, and skilled trades employers; provide for. Amends sec. 1136 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1136) & adds sec. 1139a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; school districts; access to high school pupil directory for representatives of proprietary schools, community colleges, and skilled trades employers; provide for. Amends sec. 1136 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1136) & adds sec. 1139a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 509 (Y: 61 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-10SenateReferred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment
2017-12-13HouseTransmitted
2017-12-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 509 Yeas 61 Nays 49
2017-12-13HouseRead A Third Time
2017-12-13HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-12-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-12-13HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted And Amended
2017-12-13HouseRead A Second Time
2017-12-12HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-12-12HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-10-24HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/19/2017
2017-10-19HouseReferred To Committee On Workforce And Talent Development
2017-10-19HouseRead A First Time
2017-10-19HouseIntroduced By Representative Sue Allor

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback