MI HB5138 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: controlled substances; sentencing guidelines for delivering, manufacturing, or possessing with intent to deliver heroin or fentanyl; amend. Amends sec. 13m, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13m). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5137'19
Title
Crimes: controlled substances; sentencing guidelines for delivering, manufacturing, or possessing with intent to deliver heroin or fentanyl; amend. Amends sec. 13m, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13m). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5137'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-06-10 | House | Transmitted |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 Yeas 105 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-06-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-06-03 | House | Substitute (h-5) Adopted |
2020-06-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-5) |
2019-10-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/23/2019 |
2019-10-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-10-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Joseph Tate |