MI HB5137 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: controlled substances; crime of manufacturing, delivering, or possession of with intent to deliver heroin or fentanyl; modify to reflect changes in sentencing guidelines. Amends sec. 7401 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7401). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5138'19
Title
Crimes: controlled substances; crime of manufacturing, delivering, or possession of with intent to deliver heroin or fentanyl; modify to reflect changes in sentencing guidelines. Amends sec. 7401 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7401). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5138'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 237 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 233 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 237 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 233 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-06-10 | House | Transmitted |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed Roll Call # 237 Yeas 105 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-06-10 | House | Vote Reconsidered |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 233 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-06-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-06-03 | House | Substitute (h-5) Adopted |
2020-06-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-5) |
2019-10-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/23/2019 |
2019-10-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-10-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Alexander |