MI HB5130 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-07 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-07 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement: other; employment contract with a new employee to cover academy tuition; allow under certain conditions. Amends sec. 8 of 1978 PA 390 (MCL 408.478).
Title
Law enforcement: other; employment contract with a new employee to cover academy tuition; allow under certain conditions. Amends sec. 8 of 1978 PA 390 (MCL 408.478).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 570 (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 570 (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2021-12-02 | House | Transmitted |
2021-12-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 570 Yeas 98 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 |
2021-12-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-12-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-12-01 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-12-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-11-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-11-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-06-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-06-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Mike Mueller |