MI HB5124 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Assigned Pa 33'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Assigned Pa 33'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax: delinquent taxes; provisions for reducing redemption amounts; modify. Amends secs. 78g, 78k & 78q of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.78g et seq.).
Title
Property tax: delinquent taxes; provisions for reducing redemption amounts; modify. Amends secs. 78g, 78k & 78q of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.78g et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 55 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 50 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 349 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 50 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 349 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned Pa 33'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-03-03 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/02/2020 01:12 Pm |
2020-03-03 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/02/2020 08:01 Am |
2020-02-20 | House | Presented To The Governor 02/21/2020 01:22 Pm |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-02-18 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-02-18 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 55 Yeas 105 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-02-18 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-02-18 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Title Amended |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 50 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2019-12-10 | House | Transmitted |
2019-12-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 349 Yeas 106 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-12-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-12-10 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-12-10 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2019-12-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-12-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-10-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/22/2019 |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2019-10-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Wendell Byrd |