MI HB5124 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-07 - Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-07 - Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; no-fault; personal protection insurance; allow certain individuals to partially waive coverage. Amends sec. 3107 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3107).
Title
Insurance; no-fault; personal protection insurance; allow certain individuals to partially waive coverage. Amends sec. 3107 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3107).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-07 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day |
2017-11-02 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2017-10-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/17/2017 |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2017-10-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Tim Greimel |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-5124 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-5124.htm |