MI HB5123 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 632'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 632'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Children; foster care; information regarding the foster children's assurance of quality foster care policy; require the department of human services to provide to foster children. Amends 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.951 - 722.960) by adding sec. 8d.
Title
Children; foster care; information regarding the foster children's assurance of quality foster care policy; require the department of human services to provide to foster children. Amends 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.951 - 722.960) by adding sec. 8d.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 804 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 425 (Y: 99 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 425 (Y: 99 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 632'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 6:16 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 4:43 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 5:02 Pm |
2018-12-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-18 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 804 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2017-12-05 | House | Transmitted |
2017-12-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 425 Yeas 99 Nays 9 |
2017-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-30 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-11-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-31 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-31 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-10-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/17/2017 |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-10-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger |