MI HB5120 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 83'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Highways; name; portion of M-15 in the city of Vassar; designate as the "Specialist 5 Michael May and Corporal Chris Esckelson Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 15a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highways; name; portion of M-15 in the city of Vassar; designate as the "Specialist 5 Michael May and Corporal Chris Esckelson Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 15a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 146 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 490 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseAssigned Pa 83'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-04-10HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 3/26/2018 @ 2:54 Pm
2018-04-10HouseApproved By The Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:22 Pm
2018-03-20HousePresented To The Governor 3/19/2018 @ 9:50 Am
2018-03-14HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-03-14HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-03-14HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-03-14SenateInserted Full Title
2018-03-14SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 146 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2018-03-08SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-03-08SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-03-06SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-03-06SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-01-10SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation
2017-12-13HouseTransmitted
2017-12-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 490 Yeas 110 Nays 0
2017-12-13HouseRead A Third Time
2017-12-13HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-12-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-12-13HouseRead A Second Time
2017-12-05HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-12-05HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-10-18HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/17/2017
2017-10-17HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2017-10-17HouseRead A First Time
2017-10-17HouseIntroduced By Representative Edward Canfield

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-5120
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-5120.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-5120.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-5120.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-5120.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0083.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-12-05-093.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-12-13-097.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-06-024.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-14-028.htm

Bill Comments

feedback