MI HB5115 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-30 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-30 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel; licensure of medical first responders; allow at 16 years of age. Amends sec. 20950 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20950).
Title
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel; licensure of medical first responders; allow at 16 years of age. Amends sec. 20950 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20950).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-09-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-06-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/23/2021 |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Workforce, Trades, And Talent |
2021-06-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Yaroch |
Subjects
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): health and human services