MI HB5099 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Assigned Pa 117'24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Assigned Pa 117'24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: Michigan strategic fund; research and development tax credit program report; require the Michigan strategic fund to assist in its preparation. Amends sec. 9 of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2009).
Title
Economic development: Michigan strategic fund; research and development tax credit program report; require the Michigan strategic fund to assist in its preparation. Amends sec. 9 of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2009).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 82 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 433 (Y: 77 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 433 (Y: 77 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | House | Assigned Pa 117'24 |
2024-07-30 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 12:42 Pm |
2024-07-30 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/23/2024 10:42 Am |
2024-07-30 | House | Presented To The Governor 07/11/2024 01:34 Pm |
2024-04-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2024-04-10 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2024-04-10 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 82 Yeas 23 Nays 12 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-11-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-11-01 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-10-31 | House | Transmitted |
2023-10-31 | House | Title Amended |
2023-10-31 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 433 Yeas 77 Nays 33 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-10-31 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-10-31 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-10-31 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-10-31 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2023-10-31 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-10-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/05/2023 |
2023-10-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business |
2023-10-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Rachel Hood |