MI HB5097 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 97'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Counties; boards and commissions; permit fee required for a government entity or telecommunication provider working within a county right-of-way; clarify limits, and clarify bonding and insurance requirements for telecommunication providers working within a county right-of-way. Amends sec. 19b, ch. IV of 1909 PA 283 (MCL 224.19b).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties; boards and commissions; permit fee required for a government entity or telecommunication provider working within a county right-of-way; clarify limits, and clarify bonding and insurance requirements for telecommunication providers working within a county right-of-way. Amends sec. 19b, ch. IV of 1909 PA 283 (MCL 224.19b).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 173 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 114 (Y: 68 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseAssigned Pa 97'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-04-10HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 4/2/2018 @ 4:14 Pm
2018-04-10HouseApproved By The Governor 4/2/2018 @ 12:01 Pm
2018-04-10HousePresented To The Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:56 Pm
2018-03-21HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-03-21HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect
2018-03-21SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 173 Yeas 29 Nays 5 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2018-03-20SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-03-20SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-03-13SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-03-13SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-03-13SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-03-01SenateReferred To Committee On Energy And Technology
2018-02-28HouseTransmitted
2018-02-28HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 114 Yeas 68 Nays 41
2018-02-28HouseRead A Third Time
2018-02-27HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-02-27HouseSubstitute H-4 Adopted
2018-02-27HouseSubstitute H-2 Not Adopted
2018-02-27HouseRead A Second Time
2017-12-05HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-12-05HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2017-10-17HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/12/2017
2017-10-12HouseReferred To Committee On Communications And Technology
2017-10-12HouseRead A First Time
2017-10-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Beth Griffin

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-5097
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-5097.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-5097.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-5097.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-5097.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0097.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-12-05-093.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-28-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-13-027.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-21-031.htm

Bill Comments

feedback