MI HB5095 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Re-referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Environmental protection; water pollution; permit for ballast water discharge from oceangoing vessels; adopt Coast Guard standards. Amends sec. 3112 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.3112).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental protection; water pollution; permit for ballast water discharge from oceangoing vessels; adopt Coast Guard standards. Amends sec. 3112 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.3112).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 558 (Y: 56 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 549 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 462 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 365 (Y: 66 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05HouseRe-referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
2018-09-05HouseVetoed By The Governor 06/29/2018
2018-08-15HousePresented To The Governor 6/25/2018 @ 3:48 Pm
2018-06-12HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-06-12HouseRep. Sue Allor Removed As Cosponsor
2018-06-12HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-06-12House Roll Call # 558 Yeas 56 Nays 52
2018-06-12HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-06-12HouseRule Suspended
2018-06-12HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-06-12HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-06-12SenatePassed Roll Call # 549 Yeas 26 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-06-12SenateSubstitute S-1 As Amended Adopted
2017-12-13SenatePostponed For The Day
2017-12-13SenateVote Reconsidered
2017-11-09SenateInserted Full Title
2017-11-09SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 462 Yeas 25 Nays 11 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2017-11-09SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-11-09SenateRules Suspended
2017-11-09SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-11-09SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-11-09SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-11-09SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-11-09SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-11-07SenateReferred To Committee On Natural Resources
2017-11-02HouseTransmitted
2017-11-02HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 365 Yeas 66 Nays 42
2017-11-02HouseRead A Third Time
2017-11-02HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-11-02HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-11-02HouseAmended
2017-11-02HouseRead A Second Time
2017-10-31HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-10-31HouseReported With Recommendation With Amendment(s)
2017-10-17HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/12/2017
2017-10-12HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
2017-10-12HouseRead A First Time
2017-10-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Dan Lauwers

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-5095
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-5095.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-5095.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-5095.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-5095.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-31-084.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-11-02-086.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-11-09-094.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-06-12-060.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-06-12-059.htm

Bill Comments

feedback