MI HB5092 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-28 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-28 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; public school employees; funding of required contribution amount by employer; clarify. Amends sec. 131 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1431).
Title
Retirement; public school employees; funding of required contribution amount by employer; clarify. Amends sec. 131 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1431).
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Lilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 402 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2017-11-09 | House | Transmitted |
2017-11-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 402 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2017-11-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-08 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2017-11-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-11-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2017-10-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/12/2017 |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Liability Reform |
2017-10-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Lilly |