MI HB5090 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Assigned Pa 27'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Assigned Pa 27'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor: permits; conditions under which a social district permittee may sell and serve alcoholic liquor in a commons area; modify, and eliminate sunset. Amends sec. 551 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1551).
Title
Liquor: permits; conditions under which a social district permittee may sell and serve alcoholic liquor in a commons area; modify, and eliminate sunset. Amends sec. 551 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1551).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 45 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 559 (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 550 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 559 (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 550 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Assigned Pa 27'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-03-10 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/10/2022 11:30 Am |
2022-03-10 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/10/2022 10:18 Am |
2022-02-24 | House | Presented To The Governor 02/28/2022 11:16 Am |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-02-23 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 45 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-11-10 | House | Transmitted |
2021-11-10 | House | Passed Roll Call # 559 Yeas 104 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-11-10 | House | Vote Reconsidered |
2021-11-10 | House | Title Amended |
2021-11-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 550 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-11-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-11-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-11-09 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2021-11-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-06-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/22/2021 |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-06-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Tc Clements |