MI HB5082 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Assigned Pa 87'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Assigned Pa 87'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial code; warehouse receipts; general revisions to article 7 of the uniform commercial code; provide for. Amends secs. 1201, 2103, 2104, 2310, 2323, 2401, 2503, 2505, 2506, 2509, 2605, 2705, 2A103, 2A514, 2A526, 4104, 4210, 7101, 7102, 7103, 7104, 7105, 7201, 7202, 7203, 7204, 7205, 7206, 7207, 7208, 7209, 7210, 7301, 7302, 7303, 7304, 7305, 7307, 7308, 7309, 7401, 7402, 7403, 7404, 7501, 7502, 7503, 7504, 7505, 7506, 7507, 7508, 7509, 7601, 7602, 7603, 8103, 9102, 9203, 9207, 9208, 9301, 9310, 9312, 9313, 9314, 9317, 9338 & 9601 of 1962 PA 174 (MCL 440.1201 et seq.) & adds sec. 7106 & pt. 7. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5081'11, HB 5083'11
Title
Commercial code; warehouse receipts; general revisions to article 7 of the uniform commercial code; provide for. Amends secs. 1201, 2103, 2104, 2310, 2323, 2401, 2503, 2505, 2506, 2509, 2605, 2705, 2A103, 2A514, 2A526, 4104, 4210, 7101, 7102, 7103, 7104, 7105, 7201, 7202, 7203, 7204, 7205, 7206, 7207, 7208, 7209, 7210, 7301, 7302, 7303, 7304, 7305, 7307, 7308, 7309, 7401, 7402, 7403, 7404, 7501, 7502, 7503, 7504, 7505, 7506, 7507, 7508, 7509, 7601, 7602, 7603, 8103, 9102, 9203, 9207, 9208, 9301, 9310, 9312, 9313, 9314, 9317, 9338 & 9601 of 1962 PA 174 (MCL 440.1201 et seq.) & adds sec. 7106 & pt. 7. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5081'11, HB 5083'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 161 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 11 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 11 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | House | Assigned Pa 87'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-04-17 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/11/2012 @ 3:58 Pm |
2012-04-17 | House | Approved By The Governor 4/10/2012 @ 8:28 Am |
2012-04-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 4/3/2012 @ 1:56 Pm |
2012-03-27 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-03-27 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-03-27 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 161 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
2012-01-25 | House | Transmitted |
2012-01-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 11 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2012-01-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-01-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-01-24 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-01-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-12-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-12-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-10-19 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/19/2011 |
2011-10-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Services |
2011-10-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-10-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Cotter |