MI HB5080 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victims; rights; crimes victim's right to give oral statement to parole board; amend in certain cases. Amends secs. 19 & 21 of 1985 PA 87 (MCL 780.769 & 780.771). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5078'15, HB 5079'15
Title
Crime victims; rights; crimes victim's right to give oral statement to parole board; amend in certain cases. Amends secs. 19 & 21 of 1985 PA 87 (MCL 780.769 & 780.771). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5078'15, HB 5079'15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-12-01 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/12/2015 |
2015-11-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-11-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-11-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Dave Pagel |