MI HB5077 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities: certificate of need; requirement for the certificate of need commission to post meeting agenda on a public website at least 3 business days before their meeting; provide for. Amends sec. 22213 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.22213).
Title
Health facilities: certificate of need; requirement for the certificate of need commission to post meeting agenda on a public website at least 3 business days before their meeting; provide for. Amends sec. 22213 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.22213).
Sponsors
Rep. Sara Cambensy [D] | Rep. Bronna Kahle [R] | Rep. Gary Howell [R] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 41 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2022-02-09 | House | Transmitted |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 41 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-02-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-02-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-02-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-06-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/22/2021 |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-06-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Sara Cambensy |