MI HB5062 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 271'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 271'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; other; postelection audits and continuing election education programs; add to the Michigan election law and make other miscellaneous changes to the Michigan election law. Amends secs. 31, 33, 514, 679a, 811, 847 & 942 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.31 et seq.) & adds sec. 31a.
Title
Elections; other; postelection audits and continuing election education programs; add to the Michigan election law and make other miscellaneous changes to the Michigan election law. Amends secs. 31, 33, 514, 679a, 811, 847 & 942 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.31 et seq.) & adds sec. 31a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 472 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 492 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Amendment(s) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 155 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 492 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Amendment(s) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 155 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | House | Assigned Pa 271'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-07-18 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/3/2012 @ 11:54 Am |
2012-07-18 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/27/2012 @ 8:18 Pm |
2012-07-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/22/2012 @ 11:34 Am |
2012-06-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-06-14 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-06-14 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2012-06-14 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 472 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2012-06-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-06-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Title Amended |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 492 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Amendment(s) |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |
2012-03-29 | House | Transmitted |
2012-03-29 | House | Title Amended |
2012-03-29 | House | Passed Roll Call # 155 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2012-03-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2012-03-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2011-10-13 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/13/2011 |
2011-10-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Redistricting And Elections |
2011-10-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-10-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Anthony Forlini |