MI HB5061 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Re-referred To Committee On Redistricting And Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Re-referred To Committee On Redistricting And Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; absent voters; photograph identification; require when obtaining an absentee ballot, require certain reporting by local clerks concerning registration affidavits, and require secretary of state to develop information displays indicating that ballot coaching in residential care facilities is prohibited. Amends secs. 761, 813 & 829 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.761 et seq.) & adds sec. 38.
Title
Elections; absent voters; photograph identification; require when obtaining an absentee ballot, require certain reporting by local clerks concerning registration affidavits, and require secretary of state to develop information displays indicating that ballot coaching in residential care facilities is prohibited. Amends secs. 761, 813 & 829 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.761 et seq.) & adds sec. 38.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradford Jacobsen [R] | Rep. Eileen Kowall [R] | Rep. Kenneth Kurtz [R] | Rep. Sharon Tyler [R] |
Sen. Marty Knollenberg [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 471 (Y: 65 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 153 (Y: 65 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 153 (Y: 65 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Redistricting And Elections |
2012-07-18 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 07/03/2012 |
2012-07-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/22/2012 @ 11:32 Am |
2012-06-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-06-14 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-06-14 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2012-06-14 | House | Roll Call # 471 Yeas 65 Nays 45 |
2012-06-14 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-06-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-06-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |
2012-03-29 | House | Transmitted |
2012-03-29 | House | Title Amended |
2012-03-29 | House | Passed Roll Call # 153 Yeas 65 Nays 45 |
2012-03-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2012-03-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2011-10-13 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/13/2011 |
2011-10-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Redistricting And Elections |
2011-10-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-10-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Bradford Jacobsen |
Subjects
Elections, absent voters
Elections, ballots
Elections, election officials
Elections, voters
Health facilities, homes for the aged
Health facilities, nursing homes
State agencies (existing), state
Elections, ballots
Elections, election officials
Elections, voters
Health facilities, homes for the aged
Health facilities, nursing homes
State agencies (existing), state