MI HB5058 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Reassigned To Committee On Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Reassigned To Committee On Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Food: adulterated; adulteration of food containing industrial hemp; prohibit. Amends sec. 1105 of 2000 PA 92 (MCL 289.1105).
Title
Food: adulterated; adulteration of food containing industrial hemp; prohibit. Amends sec. 1105 of 2000 PA 92 (MCL 289.1105).
Sponsors
Rep. TC Clements [R] | Rep. Pat Outman [R] | Rep. Mike Mueller [R] | Rep. Jack O'Malley [R] |
Rep. Bryan Posthumus [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 61 (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Agriculture |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-02-17 | House | Transmitted |
2022-02-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 61 Yeas 98 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-02-15 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-02-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-06-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/17/2021 |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-06-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Tc Clements |