MI HB5057 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-10-24 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-10-24 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: no-fault; option to exclude work loss benefits; expand. Amends sec. 3107 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3107).
Title
Insurance: no-fault; option to exclude work loss benefits; expand. Amends sec. 3107 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3107).
Sponsors
Rep. Lori Stone [D] | Rep. Brenda Carter [D] | Rep. Jennifer Conlin [D] | Rep. Kevin Coleman [D] |
Rep. Helena Scott [D] | Rep. Tyrone Carter [D] | Rep. Mike McFall [D] | Rep. Stephanie Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-10-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-10-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-09-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/27/2023 |
2023-09-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services |
2023-09-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-09-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Lori Stone |