MI HB5055 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; warrants; defraying of costs incurred by local unit of government in executing bench warrants; allow. Amends sec. 1f, ch. IX of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 769.1f).
Title
Criminal procedure; warrants; defraying of costs incurred by local unit of government in executing bench warrants; allow. Amends sec. 1f, ch. IX of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 769.1f).
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Johnson [R] | Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] | Sen. Kevin Daley [R] | Sen. Jon Bumstead [R] |
Rep. Thomas Leonard [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) |
2013-10-08 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/04/2013 |
2013-10-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2013-10-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Joel Johnson |