MI HB5055 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 422'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 422'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Employment security; administration; privilege for testimony in Michigan employment security commission proceedings; provide waiver under certain circumstances. Amends 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.1 - 421.75) by adding sec. 11a.
Title
Employment security; administration; privilege for testimony in Michigan employment security commission proceedings; provide waiver under certain circumstances. Amends 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.1 - 421.75) by adding sec. 11a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 956 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 609 (Y: 63 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 609 (Y: 63 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | House | Assigned Pa 422'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2012 @ 2:11 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 9:05 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 9:56 Am |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 956 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-11-28 | House | Transmitted |
2012-11-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 609 Yeas 63 Nays 46 |
2012-11-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-09-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-09-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-10-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/12/2011 |
2011-10-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-10-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-10-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Holly Hughes |
Subjects
Administrative procedure, other
Civil procedure, evidence
Crimes, perjury
Criminal procedure, privileges
Employment security, administration
Civil procedure, evidence
Crimes, perjury
Criminal procedure, privileges
Employment security, administration