MI HB5046 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Pa 48'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Pa 48'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; other; waiver of driver responsibility fee for successful participation in DWI sobriety court program; provide for on or after October 1, 2018. Amends sec. 304 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.304).
Title
Traffic control; other; waiver of driver responsibility fee for successful participation in DWI sobriety court program; provide for on or after October 1, 2018. Amends sec. 304 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.304).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 77 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 84 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 372 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 84 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 372 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Assigned Pa 48'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-03-06 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/1/2018 @ 4:16 Pm |
2018-03-06 | House | Approved By The Governor 3/1/2018 @ 1:34 Pm |
2018-02-21 | House | Presented To The Governor 2/20/2018 @ 3:23 Pm |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-02-14 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-02-14 | House | Roll Call # 77 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-02-14 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-02-14 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-02-14 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 84 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-11-02 | House | Transmitted |
2017-11-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 372 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2017-11-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-01 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2017-11-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-10-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/28/2017 |
2017-09-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-09-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Steve Marino |
Subjects
Courts: drug court
State agencies (existing): state
Traffic control: driver license
Traffic control: other
State agencies (existing): state
Traffic control: driver license
Traffic control: other