MI HB5042 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Assigned Pa 107'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Assigned Pa 107'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children: child care; licensing requirements for child care center, group child care home, or family child care home; modify. Amends secs. 1, 5c & 5m of 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111 et seq.).
Title
Children: child care; licensing requirements for child care center, group child care home, or family child care home; modify. Amends secs. 1, 5c & 5m of 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 292 (Y: 96 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 456 (Y: 97 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 456 (Y: 97 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | House | Assigned Pa 107'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-06-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/23/2022 02:52 Pm |
2022-06-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 06/23/2022 09:58 Am |
2022-06-21 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/21/2022 10:44 Am |
2022-06-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-14 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2022-06-14 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 292 Yeas 96 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2022-06-14 | House | Senate Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2022-06-08 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-06-08 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-3) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Title Amended |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans |
2021-10-06 | House | Transmitted |
2021-10-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 456 Yeas 97 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2021-10-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-10-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-10-05 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-10-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-09-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-09-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-06-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/16/2021 |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2021-06-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-06-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Greg Vanwoerkom |