MI HB5039 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-03 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-03 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of entering a school bus with intent to do bodily harm; enact. Amends sec. 12j, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.12j). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5038'19
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of entering a school bus with intent to do bodily harm; enact. Amends sec. 12j, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.12j). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5038'19
Sponsors
Rep. Daire Rendon [R] | Rep. Jack O'Malley [R] | Rep. Mari Manoogian [D] | Rep. Tyrone Carter [D] |
Rep. Brad Paquette [R] | Rep. Beau LaFave [R] | Rep. Jewell Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-10-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/10/2019 |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2019-10-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Daire Rendon |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-5039 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-5039.htm |