MI HB5038 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-03 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-03 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; school vehicles; penalties for entering a school bus without authorization or impeding or obstructing a school bus; create. Amends sec. 59 of 1990 PA 187 (MCL 257.1859).
Title
Transportation; school vehicles; penalties for entering a school bus without authorization or impeding or obstructing a school bus; create. Amends sec. 59 of 1990 PA 187 (MCL 257.1859).
Sponsors
Rep. Jack O'Malley [R] | Rep. Mari Manoogian [D] | Rep. Tyrone Carter [D] | Rep. Daire Rendon [R] |
Rep. Brad Paquette [R] | Rep. Beau LaFave [R] | Rep. Jewell Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-10-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/10/2019 |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2019-10-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Jack O'malley |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-5038 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-5038.htm |